Accounts and annual returns LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE SEACROFT HOSPITAL

Charity number: 233364
Charity reporting is overdue by 1331 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 235 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 235 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 600 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 600 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 965 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 965 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1331 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1331 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 26 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required