RICHARD GAITSKILL AND SIR THOMAS PRESTON

Charity number: 233409
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 10 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 09 March 2021 313 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 07 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 27 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2016 21 August 2017 113 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 Not Required