RICHARD GAITSKILL AND SIR THOMAS PRESTON

Charity number: 233409
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £4.16k £3.96k £3.55k £3.35k £3.39k
Total expenditure £8.92k £4.66k £3.01k £6.97k £9.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A