Accounts and annual returns WHEATHAMPSTEAD UNITED CHARITIES

Charity number: 233430
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 13 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 03 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 03 June 2019 123 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 26 February 2018 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required