THE CATHOLIC FUND FOR HOMELESS AND DESTITUTE PEOPLE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 17 August 1964: Standard registration
- 28 April 2008: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 28 April 2008: Funds transferred to 1110480 THE CATHOLIC FUND FOR THE HOMELESS AND DESTITUTE
- THE CATHOLIC FUND (Working name)
- THE CATHOLIC FUND FOR HOMELESS AND DESTITUTE MEN (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.23k | £24.32k | £24.60k | £22.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £43.38k | £52.64k | £15.45k | £8.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 13 November 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 31 August 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 09 October 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 04 August 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 03 October 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 22 September 2005 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 16 December 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 29 September 2004 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WRITTEN CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED 31ST JULY 1991, 31ST JANUARY 1992 AND 6TH FEBRUARY 1992 AND 4TH APRIL 1992
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF HOSTELS AND ACCOMMODATION FOR HOMELESS AND DESTITUTE PEOPLE, AND TO ASSIST THESE PEOPLE TO RE-ESTABLISH THEMSELVES SPIRITUALLY AND SOCIALLY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window