METROPOLITAN POLICE (LONDON BOROUGHS OF LEWISHAM AND BROMLEY) RECREATION GROUND FUND

Charity number: 233458
Removed charity
Governing document
TRUST DEED OF 29TH APRIL 1929 AND SCHEMES DATED 28TH JUNE 1940,1ST FEBRUARY 1982 AND 16TH FEBRUARY 1988 AS AMENDED ON 16 JANUARY 2003 BY A RESOLUTION PASSED UNDER THE PROVISIONS OF SECTION 75 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993
Charitable objects
INCOME TO BE APPLIED TOWARDS THE COST OF RENTING AND EQUIPPING A RECREATION GROUND,OR IN THE PURCHASE OF THINGS AND APPLIANCES FOR USE OF THE MEMBERS OF THE ATHLETIC CLUB, OR IN DEFRAYING THE GENERAL EXPENSES OF THE ATHLETIC CLUB.
Organisation type
No information available
Registration history
  • 04 June 1964 : registered
  • 04 January 2005 : removed (CEASED TO EXIST)
Other names
  • METROPOLITAN POLICE 'P' DISTRICT RECREATION GROUND FUND (Previous name)
What the charity did
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helped
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helped
  • Makes Grants To Organisations