Financial history BFBS

Charity number: 233480
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £26.02m £27.17m £28.29m £27.56m £28.77m
Total expenditure £24.22m £27.42m £30.00m £28.08m £29.96m
Income from government contracts £23.02m £22.97m £23.64m £24.20m £24.06m
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £1.16m
Income - Charitable activities £24.99m £25.95m £26.82m £26.30m £26.66m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £728.00k £892.00k £970.00k £884.00k £951.00k
Income - Other £296.00k £323.00k £503.00k £376.00k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £23.88m £27.08m £29.65m £27.94m £29.42m
Expenditure - Raising funds £342.00k £336.00k £348.00k £147.00k £152.00k
Expenditure - Governance £208.00k £195.00k £201.00k £203.00k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £134.00k £141.00k £147.00k £147.00k £152.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £388.00k