Accounts and annual returns PILTON VILLAGE TRUST

Charity number: 233541
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 16 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 01 July 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 28 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 12 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 19 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 23 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required