Financial history PILTON VILLAGE TRUST

Charity number: 233541
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £7.76k £12.03k £8.57k £16.68k £51.55k
Total expenditure £7.34k £7.46k £12.67k £23.24k £37.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £10.00k £19.41k