STROUD AND DISTRICT MENCAP SOCIETY

Charity number: 233555
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 17 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 17 June 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 05 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 05 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 24 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 24 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 03 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 03 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 21 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 21 March 2017 On time Download