STROUD AND DISTRICT MENCAP SOCIETY

Charity number: 233555
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £76.51k £81.45k £93.94k £95.52k £93.42k
Total expenditure £78.27k £72.51k £75.71k £68.52k £99.33k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A