Accounts and annual returns ROBERT STEWART MEMORIAL UNITED REFORMED CHURCH

Charity number: 233569
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 21 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 21 March 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 24 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 19 February 2021 111 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 21 March 2022 506 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 02 November 2019 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 02 November 2019 2 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 09 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 09 August 2018 On time Download Open in new window