THE BENEFIT FUND FOR A E I CABLES EMPLOYEES

Charity number: 233693
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 02 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 10 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 16 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 16 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required