LASLETT'S ALMSHOUSES

Charity number: 233695
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £116.02k £111.05k £120.00k £126.09k £127.10k
Total expenditure £107.85k £131.57k £100.64k £99.50k £100.00k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A