THE LONDON SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA ENDOWMENT TRUST

Charity number: 233700
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £2.65m £249.66k £1.53m £561.21k £599.92k
Total expenditure £1.08m £749.03k £812.79k £919.43k £819.81k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.17m N/A £1.22m £110.55k £146.63k
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.26k N/A £570 £1.10k £1.70k
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £473.06k N/A £310.42k £449.55k £451.58k
Income - Other £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £123.00k N/A £150.00k £32.31k £57.22k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £956.55k N/A £698.14k £801.47k £727.86k
Expenditure - Raising funds £125.64k N/A £114.65k £117.97k £91.95k
Expenditure - Governance £6.75k N/A £6.14k £5.47k £5.86k
Expenditure - Grants institution £949.80k N/A £692.00k £796.00k £722.00k
Expenditure - Investment management £125.64k N/A £114.65k £117.97k £91.95k
Expenditure - Other £30 N/A £0 £0 £0