THE LONDON SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA ENDOWMENT TRUST

Charity number: 233700
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SIR ROCCO FORTE Trustee
THE FORTE CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
THE LORD FORTE FOUNDATION Received: On time
DANIEL ROSS Trustee 13 November 2018 None on record
James Lennox Mackenzie Trustee 13 November 2018
HENRY WOOD HALL LIMITED Received: On time
LADY ALIAI FORTE Trustee None on record
CHARLES EDWARD MCIAN CLARK Chair
SECOND MOVEMENT Received: On time
BRENTWOOD PHILHARMONIC ORCHESTRA Received: On time
NATIONAL YOUTH STRING ORCHESTRA Received: On time
Richard Hardie Trustee 30 November 2016 None on record
JOHN SHAKESHAFT Trustee 24 November 2015
THE GEFFRYE MUSEUM TRUST Received: On time
CARDIFF UNIVERSITY Received: On time
Harriet Rayfield Trustee 04 June 2020 None on record
KATHRYN ALEXANDRA MCDOWELL Trustee
THE LONDON SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA LIMITED Received: 4 days late
LEEDS INTERNATIONAL PIANOFORTE COMPETITION Received: 31 days late
HENRY WOOD HALL LIMITED Received: On time
LADY WENDY PARMLEY Trustee 28 June 2018 None on record