Accounts and annual returns Mineralogical Society of the United Kingdom and Ireland

Charity number: 233706
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2022 19 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 19 January 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 21 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 21 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 15 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 15 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2019 20 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 20 April 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2018 16 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 16 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window