Financial history Mineralogical Society of the United Kingdom and Ireland

Charity number: 233706
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022
Total gross income £333.76k £424.66k £326.42k £250.74k £253.07k
Total expenditure £307.22k £402.05k £303.86k £231.72k £269.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A