POOR MAN'S PIECE

Charity number: 233750
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 02 January 2020 10 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 02 January 2020 Not Required
Annual return 02 January 2019 10 March 2020 129 days late
Accounts and TAR 02 January 2019 Not Required
Annual return 02 January 2018 16 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 02 January 2018 Not Required
Annual return 02 January 2017 21 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 02 January 2017 Not Required
Annual return 02 January 2016 21 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 02 January 2016 Not Required