SALESIANS OF DON BOSCO UK

Charity number: 233779
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 17 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 28 July 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 12 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 12 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 28 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 28 August 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 31 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 31 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 05 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 05 September 2017 On time Download