SALESIANS OF DON BOSCO UK

Charity number: 233779
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £4.78m £3.33m £3.53m £10.31m £3.35m
Total expenditure £3.83m £3.59m £3.99m £4.31m £3.92m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £76.70k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.40m £1.55m £1.74m £1.88m £1.38m
Income - Other trading activities £73.92k £93.86k £66.01k £82.82k £30.19k
Income - Charitable activities £226.74k £214.22k £221.27k £245.70k £71.38k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.48m £1.47m £1.50m £1.60m £1.42m
Income - Other £1.60m £54 £78 £6.50m £445.95k
Income - Legacies £130.76k £300.61k £542.51k £647.16k £186.77k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.56m £3.45m £3.85m £4.15m £3.74m
Expenditure - Raising funds £168.69k £143.53k £138.51k £163.82k £174.05k
Expenditure - Governance £19.40k £19.18k £24.00k £21.75k £21.10k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £13.57k
Expenditure - Investment management £112.38k £120.24k £118.44k £145.24k £159.75k
Expenditure - Other £100.56k -£5.00k £5.32k £4.43k £8.10k