SALESIANS OF DON BOSCO UK

Charity number: 233779
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev SAJU JOHN MULLASSERIL SDB Trustee 01 September 2018 None on record
Rev JAKUB WOJCIECH RUSZNIAK SDB Trustee 15 August 2020 None on record
REV DR MARTIN GERARD POULSOM SDB Trustee 31 August 2016
CATHOLIC VOCATIONS PROJECT Overdue by 84 days
REV James Gerard Briody SDB Trustee 14 August 2016 None on record
Rev ANTHONY FERNANDES SDB Trustee 15 August 2015 None on record
REV BOB GARDNER SDB Trustee 15 August 2015 None on record