Accounts and annual returns EMILY LYTTELTON AND UNITED CHARITIES

Charity number: 233895
Charity reporting is overdue by 111 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 04 June 2023 Overdue Overdue by 111 days
Accounts and TAR 04 June 2023 Overdue Overdue by 111 days
Annual return 04 June 2022 26 July 2023 113 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 04 June 2021 04 May 2022 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 04 June 2020 12 May 2021 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 04 June 2019 12 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 04 June 2019 Not Required