JOHN HAMMOND CHARITY

Charity number: 234031
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £7.13k £7.68k £8.22k £8.21k £8.45k
Total expenditure £4.28k £4.20k £3.30k £2.40k £13.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A