THE INSTITUTE OF FINANCIAL ACCOUNTANTS AND INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF BOOK-KEEPERS BENEVOLENT FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing aid in times of hardship for our members, ex-members and their dependents
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
- Australia
- Estonia
- Ghana
- Guernsey
- India
- Ireland
- Isle Of Man
- Ivory Coast
- Jersey
- Latvia
- Lithuania
- Nigeria
- Northern Ireland
- Russia
- Scotland
- Singapore
- Sri Lanka
- Zambia
Governance
- THE INSTITUTE OF BOOK-KEEPERS BENEVOLENT FUND (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.91k | £15.79k | £31.89k | £16.78k | £13.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.52k | £29.35k | £15.79k | £13.14k | £4.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 11 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 04 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 15 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 15 July 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 21 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 27 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
REGULATIONS ADOPTED 21ST MAY 1966 AMENDED 8TH JUNE 1974, 21ST JUNE 1975, 17TH JULY 1981, 31ST JULY 1983, 10TH JUNE 1988, 29TH JULY 1989, 29 AUGUST 2006 AND 20 FEBRUARY 2013. AS AMENDED ON 12 DEC 2017 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 07 NOV 2018 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 21 NOV 2019
Charitable objects
(1) THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE: (A) FOR THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE OR HAVE BEEN: (I) FULL MEMBERS OF THE INSTITUTE OF FINANCIAL ACCOUNTANTS (A COMPANY REGISTERED IN ENGLAND AND WALES WITH COMPANY NUMBER 09350923) (IFA), AS THAT TERM IS DEFINED BY THE ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION AND BYE-LAWS OF THE IFA, BUT EXCLUDING ALL PERSONS WHOSE FULL MEMBERSHIP OF THE IFA IS AUTOMATIC BY VIRTUE OF THEIR MEMBERSHIP OF THE INSTITUTE OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTANTS (OF AUSTRALIA) OR OF ANY OTHER ORGANISATION, OR OTHERWISE HAS BEEN GRANTED BY THE IFA UNDER A RECIPROCAL ARRANGEMENT WITH ANY OTHER ORGANISATION; (II) MEMBERS OF THE INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF BOOK-KEEPERS (A COMPANY REGISTERED IN ENGLAND AND WALES WITH COMPANY NUMBER 01119378) (IAB), AS DEFINED IN THE ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION AND BYE LAWS OF THE IAB; (III) THE DEPENDENTS OF ANY OF THE PERSONS DESCRIBED IN (I) AND (II) ABOVE; (B) FOR THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE CURRENT STUDENTS OF THE IFA OR THE IAB. (2) IF THE TRUSTEES ARE UNABLE TO EXPEND THEIR INCOME ON THE BENEFICIARIES, THEY MAY AT THEIR DISCRETION APPLY SURPLUS FUNDS FOR THE RELIEF OF THE EDUCATIONAL NEEDS OF PERSONS STUDYING TO UNDERTAKE THE PROFESSIONAL QUALIFICATIONS OF THE IFA AND/OR IAB. 3) THE FUND SHALL BE RAISED BY DONATION AND VOLUNTARY SUBSCRIPTIONS. (4) GRANTS IN ANY ONE FINANCIAL YEAR SHALL NOT EXCEED THE TOTAL INCOME OF THE PREVIOUS TWO FINANCIAL YEARS WITHOUT THE CONSENT OF THE MEMBERS AT A GENERAL MEETING.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window