THE SOUTH EAST WALES DEAF CHURCH ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 234138
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 06/04/2016 06/04/2017 06/04/2018 06/04/2019 06/04/2020
Total gross income £12.98k £14.15k £11.40k £11.38k £10.55k
Total expenditure £9.27k £9.38k £6.50k £4.91k £5.64k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A