THOMAS HARDING
Charity number: 234179
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
HELPING POOR PEOPLE IN THE ANCIENT PARISH OF HINTON PARVA, SWINDON, WILTS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2009
Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
- Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
- Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
- Swindon
Governance
Registration history:
- 28 April 1964: Standard registration
- 09 June 2012: Removed (Does not operate)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
- BATTS HARDINGS & WILSONS CHARITIES (Working name)
- THE HARDING, BATT AND WILSON CHARITIES (Previous name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | 29 April 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | 26 January 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 24 NOVEMBER 1936
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE POOR OF THE ANCIENT PARISH OF LITTLE HINTON
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
ANCIENT PARISH OF LITTLE HINTON
Linked charities
Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 24 NOVEMBER 1936
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE POOR OF THE ANCIENT PARISH OF LITTLE HINTON
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF LITTLE HINTON
Registration history
- 28 April 1964 : Standard registration
- 09 June 2012 : Removed
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window