Accounts and annual returns PALLOTTINE MISSIONARY SISTERS OF THE CATHOLIC APOSTOLATE

Charity number: 234185
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 14 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 14 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 14 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 14 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 25 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 25 July 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 26 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 03 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 10 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 10 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window