BIRMINGHAM DIOCESAN TRUST

Charity number: 234216
Regulatory alert
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Most Rev Bernard Longley Chair 14 January 2013
CATHOLIC TRUST FOR ENGLAND AND WALES
THE BRITISH TRUST FOR THE ECUMENICAL INSTITUTE FOR ADVANCED THEOLOGICAL STUDY IN JERUSALEM Charity reporting is up to date
THE VALLADOLID TRUST FUND Charity reporting is up to date
THE VENERABLE ENGLISH COLLEGE TRUST Charity reporting is up to date
MATER ECCLESIAE COLLEGE Recently registered
BIRMINGHAM CHURCHES TOGETHER Charity reporting is up to date
MARYVALE INSTITUTE Charity reporting is up to date
NEWMAN UNIVERSITY Charity reporting is up to date
Rev Richard Adrian Walker Trustee 01 September 2020 None on record
Peter John Leonard Simmonds Vella Trustee 10 July 2020 None on record
Rt Rev David Ernest Charles Evans Trustee 19 March 2020 None on record
Rt Rev Stephen James Lawrence Wright Trustee 01 September 2019 None on record
BIRMINGHAM ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESAN TRUSTEES REGISTERED Trustee 01 February 2012 None on record
Sophia Pain Trustee 01 September 2019 None on record
Ms H Bardy Trustee 25 October 2013
THE KENELM YOUTH TRUST LIMITED Charity reporting is up to date
Rev. Mr David Palmer Trustee 18 July 2014
THE VENERABLE ENGLISH COLLEGE TRUST Charity reporting is up to date
SEHION MINISTRIES Charity reporting is up to date
MARYVALE INSTITUTE Charity reporting is up to date
RT REV WILLIAM KENNEY Trustee 14 January 2013
INFORMATION NETWORK FOCUS ON RELIGIOUS MOVEMENTS Charity reporting is up to date
Mr C Loughran Trustee 23 October 2015 None on record
Professor Deirdre Kelly CBE Trustee 12 April 2019
GENERAL MEDICAL COUNCIL Charity reporting is up to date
Rev DAVID MCGOUGH Trustee 14 January 2013
ST MARY'S COLLEGE OSCOTT CIO
Rev JONATHAN VEASEY STL Trustee 14 January 2013
THE ANDREW ROBINSON YOUNG PEOPLE'S TRUST Charity reporting is up to date
Jacqui Francis Trustee 12 April 2019
THE COLE CHARITABLE TRUST Charity reporting is up to date
Peter John Vince Trustee 24 April 2020 None on record