Register of Charities - The Charity Commission FITZGERALD AIR-MAIL FUND
Charity number: 292636-5
Removed charity
Governing document
MEMORANDUM DATED 11 AUGUST 1953 AND SCHEMES OF 18 JULY 1960 (HIGH COURT OF JUSTICE), 26 MARCH 1976.SCHEME OF 19 MAY 1994
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE AND CATALOGUE THE FITZGERALD AIR-MAIL COLLECTION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
- 23 October 1985: Standard registration
- 16 October 2003: Removed (Exempt charity)
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.