BEDFORDSHIRE CHARITABLE TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 234329
Charity reporting is up to date (58 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £252.31k £222.87k £238.39k £304.17k £231.17k
Total expenditure £401.95k £408.37k £477.37k £458.55k £371.66k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A