CHARLES BALLAM'S CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a church based charity which provides financial support to people in the Lytchett Minster & Upton area, who are disadvantaged.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Dorset
- Poole
Governance
- 27 May 1964: Standard registration
- THE CHARLES BALLAM CHARITY TRUST (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Karen James | Trustee | 10 October 2019 |
|
|||||
Glyn Owen | Trustee | 12 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Christine Snape | Trustee | 12 October 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.54k | £2.69k | £2.08k | £2.50k | £3.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.14k | £2.24k | £2.02k | £2.24k | £3.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 01 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 06 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
COURT SCHEME DATED 29 JULY 1940
Charitable objects
INCOME TO BE USED IN VARIOUS PROPORTIONS AS FOLLOWS:- 1. FOR LOWER LYTCHELL METHODIST SUNDAY SCHOOL. 2. FOR CLOTHING CLUB CONNECTED WITH METHODIST CHAPEL, LOWER LYTCHETT. 3. FOR USE OF SAID CHAPEL. 4. FOR RELIEF OF POOR WIDOWS OVER 60 YEARS OF AGE. 5. REVIVAL SERVICES OR FOR A TEMPERANCE MISSION. 6. POOR MEN OVER 70 YEARS OF AGE. 7. CREEKMOOR METHODIST SUNDAY SCHOOL. 8. CORNELIA HOSPITAL AT POOLE. 9. RELIEF OF DISTRESS AMONG MEMBERS OF THE CHAPEL AT LYTCHETT.(FOR DEATAILS SEE COURT SCHEME).
Area of benefit
LYTCHETT MINSTER, POOLE AND CREEKMOOR.
Contact information
- Address:
-
79 Dorchester Road
Upton
POOLE
BH16 5NN
- Phone:
- 01202631915
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window