Financial history THE UNITED SOCIETY

Charity number: 234518
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £3.97m £3.18m £3.00m £3.12m £3.40m
Total expenditure £4.35m £4.25m £3.67m £3.11m £3.30m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £11.13k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.04m £1.43m £1.21m £1.34m £1.57m
Income - Other trading activities £115.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.68m £1.70m £1.70m £1.75m £1.80m
Income - Other £131.00k £54.00k £96.00k £35.00k £35.00k
Income - Legacies £1.14m £631.00k £452.00k £576.00k £614.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.80m £3.19m £3.05m £2.65m £2.92m
Expenditure - Raising funds £550.00k £411.00k £619.00k £462.00k £382.00k
Expenditure - Governance £287.00k £163.00k £117.00k £102.00k £144.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.85m £0 £1.26m £1.17m £1.62m
Expenditure - Investment management £52.00k £51.00k £51.00k £60.00k £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £650.00k £0 £0 £0