Dogfen lywodraethu CHARITY OF JAMES MEW FOR POOR AND AFFLICTED MEN AND WOMEN
Rhif yr elusen: 234600
Elusen a dynnwyd
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
WILL PROVED IN THE PRINCIPAL REGISTRY 30TH MAY 1913 AND SCHEMES OF THE 3RD JULY 1961 AND 5TH SEPTEMBER 1969, 4TH OCTOBER 1977, 31ST DECEMBER 1980 AND 3RD AUGUST 1990
Gwrthrychau elusennol
A PENSION OF NOT MORE THAN ú52 A YEAR TO POOR AND AFFLICTED MEN OF GOOD CHARACTER WHO ARE NOT LESS THAN 65 YEARS OF AGE AND POOR AND AFFLICTED WOMEN OF GOOD CHARACTER WHO ARE NOT LESS THAN 60 YEARS OF AGE. (FOR CONDITIONS SEE SCHEME OF THE 5TH SEPTEMBER 1969)
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
UNRESTRICTED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.