ASSOCIATION OF SERBIAN CHETNIKS RAVNE GORE IN GREAT BRITAIN LIMITED

Charity number: 234682
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 30 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 02 September 2020 215 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 02 September 2020 215 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 13 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 12 March 2019 40 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 18 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 30 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

30 June 2017 On time Download