ASSOCIATION OF SERBIAN CHETNIKS RAVNE GORE IN GREAT BRITAIN LIMITED

Charity number: 234682
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £17.33k £34.83k £71.26k £138.35k £37.48k
Total expenditure £68.58k £60.27k £119.38k £77.52k £45.59k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A