Trustees THE METROPOLITAN AND CITY POLICE ORPHANS FUND

Charity number: 234787
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CHIEF SUPERINTENDENT SIMON OVENS Chair
None on record
Stephen Davies Trustee 18 September 2018
None on record
John Howard Trustee 20 January 2017
None on record
DAVID LAWES Trustee 02 April 2015
None on record
GRAHAM GILBERT Trustee 01 August 2014
None on record
Clive Knight Trustee 01 March 2014
METROPOLITAN POLICE BENEVOLENT FUND
Received: On time
CONSTABLE DEBBIE DAVIES Trustee 12 August 2013
None on record
GLEN SMYTH Trustee
None on record