DEAN ROW UNITARIAN CHAPEL FUNDS HELD ICW

Charity number: 234851
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Unitarian religious & humanitarian objectives.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £47,160
Total expenditure: £45,545

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Cheshire East
  • Cheshire West & Chester
  • Stockport

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 June 1965: Standard registration
  • 19 October 1998: Removed (Funds transferred (s.74))
  • 19 October 1998: Funds transferred to
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • Dean Row Chapel (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Susan Dennell Trustee 17 October 2021
MANSE FOR THE MINISTER OF THE DEAN ROW CHAPEL AND THE NORCLIFFE CHAPEL
Received: On time
Deborah Julia White Trustee 17 October 2021
None on record
Ian Booth Trustee 07 March 2018
None on record
Nicola Aspeotis Trustee 01 January 2018
None on record
Peter Weigh Trustee 01 January 2018
None on record
Bridget Wenham Trustee 01 January 2018
None on record
Elizabeth Earp Trustee 01 January 2018
MANSE FOR THE MINISTER OF THE DEAN ROW CHAPEL AND THE NORCLIFFE CHAPEL
Received: On time
Beryl Booth Trustee 01 January 2013
None on record
JENIFER DORIS WILLIAMS Trustee 21 August 2011
MANSE FOR THE MINISTER OF THE DEAN ROW CHAPEL AND THE NORCLIFFE CHAPEL
Received: On time
ANNE GEMMELL Trustee
None on record
PETER GEORGE SHAW Trustee
MANSE FOR THE MINISTER OF THE DEAN ROW CHAPEL AND THE NORCLIFFE CHAPEL
Received: On time
CROSS STREET UNITARIAN CHAPEL TRUST FUNDS HELD ICW
Received: On time
CATHERINE SMEATON Trustee
MANSE FOR THE MINISTER OF THE DEAN ROW CHAPEL AND THE NORCLIFFE CHAPEL
Received: On time
MRS CHRISSIE WILKIE Trustee
MANSE FOR THE MINISTER OF THE DEAN ROW CHAPEL AND THE NORCLIFFE CHAPEL
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £57.31k £49.69k £35.87k £41.86k £47.16k
Total expenditure £54.24k £66.64k £47.28k £63.09k £45.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £2.61k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 07 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 07 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 21 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 21 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 14 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 14 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 01 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 01 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 13 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 13 May 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
WILL OF 19TH NOVEMBER 1951
Charitable objects
TO PAY EXPENSES OF AN ANNUAL SERVICE AT DEAN ROW CHAPEL WITH A SERMON ON SUBJECT "LOVE".
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 03 June 1965 : Standard registration
  • 19 October 1998 : Removed
  • 19 October 1998 : Asset transfer out

Contact information

Address:
2 CHESHAM ROAD
WILMSLOW
SK9 6HA
Phone:
01625584881