THE BISHOP TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Making donations/gifts to needy former employees on low income.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 24 June 1964: Standard registration
- BISHOP CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sam Cortese | Trustee | 27 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
ALAN REGINALD COTTIS | Trustee | 05 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
THOMAS PATRICK COURTNEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARTYN J DADDS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.36k | £1.13k | £772 | £1.24k | £2.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.23k | £10.28k | £12.03k | £11.60k | £11.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 20 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 23 April 2024 | 78 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 16 March 2021 | 39 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 6TH APRIL 1964 AND AMENDED 6TH JULY 1988.
Charitable objects
FOR OR TOWARDS SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS OR PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE AND WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING THE TRUSTEES ARE REQUESTED (BUT NOT REQUIRED) TO HAVE REGARD PRIMARILY TO THE FINANCIAL NEEDS OF EMPLOYEES AND FORMER EMPLOYEES OF MOORE PARAGON UK LIMITED AND OF ANY COMPANY ASSOCIATED THERWITH AND THE SPOUSES ISSUE AND DEPENDENTS OF ANY SUCH EMPLOYEES AND FORMER EMPLOYEES SO FAR AS SUCH OBJECTS MAY BE CHARITABLE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
34 THE MEAD
WEST WICKHAM
BR4 0BB
- Phone:
- 02087761008
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window