ZION BAPTIST CHURCH ST DAVIDS-TRUST FUNDS AND PROPERTY HELD IN CONNECTION WITH-

Charity number: 234943
Charity reporting is overdue by 38 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £7.81k £2.49k £4.18k £4.18k £4.61k
Total expenditure £7.17k £2.66k £3.25k £3.25k £3.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A