Trustees ST COLUMBA'S PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH OF ENGLAND NORTH SHIELDS (TRUST PROPERTY HELD IN CONNECTION WITH)

Charity number: 235022
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Norma Evelyn McAvoy Trustee 21 April 2021
ST COLUMBA'S NORTH SHIELDS UNITED REFORMED CHURCH CHARITY
Received: On time
JANET DALL THOMSON CHARITY.
Received: On time
Lesley Waugh Trustee 30 September 2020
ST COLUMBA'S NORTH SHIELDS UNITED REFORMED CHURCH CHARITY
Received: On time
JANET DALL THOMSON CHARITY.
Received: On time
Barbara White Trustee 30 September 2020
ST COLUMBA'S NORTH SHIELDS UNITED REFORMED CHURCH CHARITY
Received: On time
JANET DALL THOMSON CHARITY.
Received: On time
Jill Thompson Trustee 30 September 2020
None on record
Margaret Armstrong Trustee 28 April 2019
ST COLUMBA'S NORTH SHIELDS UNITED REFORMED CHURCH CHARITY
Received: On time
JANET DALL THOMSON CHARITY.
Received: On time
Helen Wendy Bradley Trustee 28 April 2019
ST COLUMBA'S NORTH SHIELDS UNITED REFORMED CHURCH CHARITY
Received: On time
JANET DALL THOMSON CHARITY.
Received: On time
Rev Trevor Jamison Trustee 16 June 2018
ST COLUMBA'S NORTH SHIELDS UNITED REFORMED CHURCH CHARITY
Received: On time
JANET DALL THOMSON CHARITY.
Received: On time
Helen Saunders Trustee 29 April 2018
ST COLUMBA'S NORTH SHIELDS UNITED REFORMED CHURCH CHARITY
Received: On time
JANET DALL THOMSON CHARITY.
Received: On time
Alison Drew Trustee 23 April 2017
ST COLUMBA'S NORTH SHIELDS UNITED REFORMED CHURCH CHARITY
Received: On time
JANET DALL THOMSON CHARITY.
Received: On time