THE RICHARD FOSTER BOLITHO ALMSHOUSE TRUST

Charity number: 235197
Charity reporting is overdue by 29 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 29 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 29 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 22 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 22 September 2020 327 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 22 September 2020 327 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 10 December 2018 40 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 10 December 2018 40 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 23 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

23 February 2017 On time Download