THE RICHARD FOSTER BOLITHO ALMSHOUSE TRUST

Charity number: 235197
Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £25.04k £28.70k £27.34k £27.85k £28.35k
Total expenditure £31.30k £26.91k £13.86k £16.38k £46.73k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A