Financial history JIREH STRICT BAPTIST CHAPEL (TRUST PROPERTY IN CONNECTION WITH)

Charity number: 235243
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £12.96k £12.96k £12.96k £13.94k £56.20k
Total expenditure £10.74k £5.98k £4.25k £10.28k £45.38k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A