Trustees FRIENDS OF HISTORIC ESSEX
Charity number: 235270
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr CHRISTOPHER THORNTON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Rachael Bailey-Gibson | Trustee | 08 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Coxall | Trustee | 24 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Julie Miller | Trustee | 24 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Neil Wiffen | Trustee | 06 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Earnshaw | Trustee | 17 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Janice Gooch | Trustee | 01 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Butler | Trustee | 17 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Professor Alison Rowlands | Trustee | 08 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Sean Michael O'Dell | Trustee | 08 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Jane Irene Bedford | Trustee | 08 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Crowe | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.