Accounts and annual returns THE INSTITUTE OF ECONOMIC AFFAIRS LIMITED

Charity number: 235351
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 15 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 15 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 01 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 01 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 30 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 15 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 15 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 21 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 21 September 2017 On time Download Open in new window