Financial history THE INSTITUTE OF ECONOMIC AFFAIRS LIMITED

Charity number: 235351
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.91m £2.13m £2.52m £2.07m £2.34m
Total expenditure £2.36m £2.33m £2.86m £2.46m £2.33m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.64m £2.01m £2.38m £1.83m £2.15m
Income - Other trading activities £40.00k £16.00k £15.00k £28.20k £30.00k
Income - Charitable activities £178.00k £58.00k £80.00k £168.55k £46.00k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £54.00k £50.00k £41.00k £37.70k £24.00k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £93.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.03m £1.96m £2.43m £2.12m £1.96m
Expenditure - Raising funds £322.00k £367.00k £428.00k £340.02k £367.00k
Expenditure - Governance £15.00k £3.00k £3.00k £5.53k £20.23k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0