Trustees STEP ONE CHARITY

Charity number: 235434
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kay Sarah O'Shaughnessy Trustee 27 October 2022
THE LIVEWELL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Charles Pallot Trustee 14 December 2021
COMMUNITY CARE TRUST (SOUTH WEST) LIMITED
Overdue by 23 days
Mark Lambert Trustee 14 December 2021
COMMUNITY CARE TRUST (SOUTH WEST) LIMITED
Overdue by 23 days
David Hawes Trustee 21 September 2021
COMMUNITY CARE TRUST (SOUTH WEST) LIMITED
Overdue by 23 days
Paul Anthony Cawthron Trustee 26 June 2019
None on record
Robert Paul Gofton Trustee 24 September 2018
COMMUNITY CARE TRUST (SOUTH WEST) LIMITED
Overdue by 23 days
Sue Sutherland Trustee 04 June 2018
None on record
Robert David Williams Trustee 01 May 2017
COMMUNITY CARE TRUST (SOUTH WEST) LIMITED
Overdue by 23 days
Mark Rusbrooke Forbes Taylor Trustee 25 November 2014
COMMUNITY CARE TRUST (SOUTH WEST) LIMITED
Overdue by 23 days