PARISH HALL CHARITY

Charity number: 235455
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 27 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 27 August 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2019 26 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2018 20 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2017 27 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2016 21 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 Not Required