ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESE OF SOUTHWARK DIOCESAN TRUST

Charity number: 1173050-1
Linked charity
Governing document
TRUST DEED DATED 21/10/1927 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL TRUST DEEDS DATED 4/11/1927, 19/5/1967, 12/5/1975 AND 22/12/2005
Charitable objects
TO ESTABLISH, MAINTAIN OR ADVANCE THE ROMAN CATHOLIC RELIGION IN THE DIOCESE BY ANY ONE OR MORE OF THE CHARITABLE OBJECTS PROMOTED OR SERVED BY THE ROMAN CATHOLIC CHURCH WITHIN THE DIOCESE.
Area of benefit
ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESE OF SOUTHWARK.
Registration history
  • 24 June 1964 : registered
Other names
  • THE ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHDIOCESE OF SOUTHWARK (Working name)
This charity is a linked charity of